skip to content

Beard, Jonathan Daryl

CPSO#: 92213

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Oct 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Child & Adolescent Mental Health
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4421
Fax: (905) 813-1594 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Roncesvalles Psychology Clinic
120 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 2L1
Canada
Phone: 416-531-5152
Fax: 647-689-2739
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:20 Oct 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:07 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016 Active
 Dr.  Jonathan Daryl Beard may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry and
            Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, only.