skip to content

Bean, Sharon Helen

CPSO#: 91839

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 May 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302-9600 Bathurst St
Maple ON  L6A 3Z8 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Bean ( CPSO# 89277 )
Dr. S. Bean ( CPSO# 91839 )

Business Address:
Suite 11 & 12
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 882-6566

Business Address:
316-34 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4R 2H6
Phone Number: (416) 993-0187

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Department of Anaesthesia
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHARON HELEN BEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2010