skip to content

Beal, Timothy Lee

CPSO#: 94237

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Rochester, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Child and Parent Resource Institute
600 Sanatorium Road
Crombie Building Office 2 01
London ON  N6H 3W7
Phone: 519-858-2774 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Jul 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2013 Active
             Dr. Timothy Lee Beal may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry, only.