skip to content

Beach, Renee A

CPSO#: 86594

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
DermAtelier on Avenue
1896 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Z8
Phone: 416 787 6060
Fax: 416 623 7303 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
RKS Dermatology Clinic, 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416 323 7546
Fax: 416 323 6236
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Renee A. Beach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Beach ( CPSO# 86594 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
5ht Floor RKS Clinic
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
Bay Dermatology Centre
Suite 536
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 515-8808

Business Address:
302 - 1448 Lawrence Avenue East
North York ON  M4S 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 750-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:11 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENEE A BEACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEACH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2013