skip to content

Bazzarelli, Amy Kathleen

CPSO#: 93225

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Saint Joseph Hospital
3080 Prince Edward St.
Vancouver BC  V5T 3N4
Phone: 604-874-1141
Fax: 604-877-8506

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Dr.
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: 705-728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

871 Thompson Dr. S.
Thompson MB  R8N 0C8
Canada
Phone: 204-677-2381
County: 
Electoral District: 

Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: 705-337-6111
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

750 Great Northern Rd.
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: 705-759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

550 Byrne Rd.
Yellowknife NT  X1A 3T3
Canada
Phone: 867-669-4111
County: 
Electoral District: 

899 W 12th Ave.
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1M9
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Church St. and 4th Ave.
Flin Flon MB  R8A 1N2
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

5544 Sunshine Coast Highway
Sechelt BC  V0N 3A0
Canada
Phone: 604 885 2224
Fax: 604 885 8628
County: 
Electoral District: 

601 10 St. NE
Salmon Arm BC  V1E 4A7
Canada
Phone: 250-833-6300
Fax: 250-833-3611
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia
Manitoba
Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:15 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMY KATHLEEN BAZZARELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAZZARELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2017