skip to content

Bayley, Nicholas Geoffrey

CPSO#: 93412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 115
675 Queen Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone: (519) 603-0623
Fax: (519) 603-0625 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nicholas G. Bayley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bayley ( CPSO# 93412 )

Business Address:
675 Queen Street South
Suite 115
Kitchener ON  N2M 1A1
Phone Number: (519) 603-0623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS GEOFFREY BAYLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015