Bayley, David Michael (CPSO#: 100003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Mar 2013

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. David M Bayley
197 Talbot St W Suite 208
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 326-0344
Fax: (519) 326-3285
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Michael Bayley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bayley ( CPSO# 100003)

Business Address:
Four Oaks Family Care
208 - 197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone Number: (519) 326-0344

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Mar 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  David  Michael  Bayley  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  family
            medicine, only.