skip to content

Bayat, Roain

CPSO#: 91378

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
Suite 300
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905) 773-7843
Fax: (905) 773-9614 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Canada
Phone: (613) 969-7400
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905-883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Roain Bayat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bayat ( CPSO# 91378 )

Business Address:
QHC Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
York Region Sleep Disorders Centre
13291 Yonge Street
Suite 300
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7843

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROAIN BAYAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAYAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013