skip to content

Baxter, Brian John

CPSO#: 29571

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 2021
EXPIRY DATE
31 May 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 2021

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 23, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian John Baxter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 23, 2021:

Dr. Baxter was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. In the face of these allegations, effective May 31, 2021, Dr. Baxter resigns from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. In light of his resignation and undertaking not to reapply, these matters were not before the Discipline Committee and no findings were made.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Member
Active Date: December 11, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Brian John Baxter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 11, 2020:

Following a College investigation, Dr. Baxter underwent remediation and submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report subsequently received by the College raised concerns about his standard of practice in his general medicine practice. As a result of the reassessment report:

Dr. Baxter will limit the number of patients he treats each day to a maximum of forty-five (45) patients per day.

Dr. Baxter will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a period of six (6) months.

Dr. Baxter will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing, well-baby care, management of chronic conditions, and medical record-keeping.

Dr. Baxter’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Baxter has completed the required elements of his SCERP dated October 4, 2017.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)