skip to content

Baunemann, Heiko

CPSO#: 21218

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 12 Feb 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 12-Feb-2020

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:21 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1973
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 12 Feb 2020