skip to content

Bauman, Katerina Lynn

CPSO#: 92914

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Reizgys, Katerina Lynn (used until: 06 Jul 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 32518 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Katerina Bauman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATERINA LYNN BAUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012