skip to content

Baugh, Charles William

CPSO#: 19415

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1953
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jul 1954
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1955
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jul 1955
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1983