skip to content

Batra, Poonam

CPSO#: 97726

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
305-1366 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 962-2964
Fax: (416) 962-2526 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. POONAM BATRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2014