skip to content

Bathina, Sudheer Reddy

CPSO#: 85689

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Mar 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Andhra Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 08 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 09 Nov 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Mar 2016