Batey, Cristina Ashley (CPSO#: 101090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  21 Apr 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Hospital
Department of Physical Medicine and
Rehabilitation
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4000
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA ASHLEY BATEY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BATEY is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. BATEY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BATEY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BATEY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BATEY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BATEY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 21 Apr 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Jul 2016 to 21 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 21 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Apr 2019