skip to content

Bastianelli, Paul Anthony Roy

CPSO#: 95349

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Centrepointe Drive, Suite 206
Ottawa, ON
K2G 6E2
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone: (613) 226-1912
Fax: 613-604-0399 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Bastianelli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bastianelli ( CPSO# 95349 )
Dr. M. Lawson ( CPSO# 95582 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-8575

Business Address:
1285 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6K9
Phone Number: (613) 733-8400

Business Address:
206 - 1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6E2
Phone Number: (613) 226-1912

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
3rd Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 738-8537

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL ANTHONY ROY BASTIANELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTIANELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 01 Jan 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016