Bastiampillai, Ravin Joseph (CPSO#: 101140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Urology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVIN JOSEPH BASTIAMPILLAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASTIAMPILLAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018