skip to content

Bastedo, Paul Alexander

CPSO#: 27520

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Bastedo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical records may send a written request c/o Dr. Charles Brisson: 201 - 29 Main St E Huntsville ON P1H 2C6
Date Received: 12 Oct 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 6, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Alexander Bastedo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 6, 2019:

Dr. Bastedo has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.