skip to content

El-Tatari, Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish

CPSO#: 88100

MEMBER STATUS
Suspended as of 01 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Jun 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bassam El-Tatari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. El-Tatari ( CPSO# 88100 )

Business Address:
Suite 328
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 946-0705

Business Address:
101 - 13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 979-5260

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2019
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 01 May 2019


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2019 Active

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Apr 2019
Summary:

On April 30, 2019, on the basis of a Statement of Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the 
 Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari committed an 
 act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
STATEMENT OF UNCONTESTED FACTS AND PLEA OF NO CONTEST 
 
Dr. El-Tatari is a 46-year-old family physician who has held a certificate of independent practice 
with the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario since 2010. At all material times, Dr. El-
Tatari practised at a walk-in clinic and at his own office in Windsor, Ontario. 
 
Patient A  
 
Dr. El-Tatari was Patient A’s family physician from 2011 to 2014.On a number of occasions, Dr. 
El-Tatari hugged Patient A before and after her appointments. The hugs made Patient A feel 
nervous and uncomfortable. 
 
During one appointment, Patient A complained of a pimple on her labia. Without adequate 
explanation to Patient A, Dr. El-Tatari examined and palpated the pimple on Patient A’s labia.  
This caused Patient A discomfort and upset.  
 
Patient B  
 
Patient B was a patient of Dr. El-Tatari’s from 2013 to 2014. On a number of occasions, Dr. El-
Tatari hugged Patient B at the end of her appointments. On one occasion, following a clinically 
indicated breast examination, Dr. El-Tatari hugged Patient B, and told her that she was his 
“favourite patient.” Dr. El-Tatari’s conduct made Patient B feel awkward and uncomfortable. 
 
Dr. El-Tatari performed breast examinations on Patient B. Dr. El-Tatari found the examinations 
difficult due to Patient B’s breast implants. Dr. El-Tatari did not provide an adequate explanation 
of the nature and purpose of the extended examinations. As a result, Patient B was left feeling 
concerned and upset about the length of those examinations. 
 
Patient C  
 
Patient C was a patient of Dr. El-Tatari from 2011 to 2015. At the end of some medical 
appointments with Dr. El-Tatari, Dr. El-Tatari hugged Patient C. Dr. El-Tatari told Patient C that 
she was “one of his special ones.” During one appointment, Dr. El-Tatari hugged Patient C while 
she was wearing an examination gown. While hugging patient C, Dr. El-Tatari asked her if she 
liked being hugged. He touched her face with his hand. Dr. El-Tatari’s conduct made Patient C 
uncomfortable. Patient C made a follow up appointment, but never returned to see Dr. El-Tatari 
after this appointment. 
 
Patient D  
 
  

 Patient D was a walk-in patient of Dr. El-Tatari in 2014. During an early appointment, Dr. El-
 Tatari hugged Patient D after she told Dr. El-Tatari that she had a miscarriage. This made Patient 
D feel awkward. During some appointments, Dr. El-Tatari touched her face with his hand, which 
made her feel uncomfortable.   
 
Patient E  
 
Patient E was a patient of Dr. El-Tatari in 2014. During one appointment, Dr. El-Tatari 
conducted a clinically indicated pelvic examination on Patient E. During the examination, 
without an adequate explanation to Patient E, Dr. El-Tatari asked Patient E to squeeze his finger 
and commented about the strength of her vaginal muscles. Dr. El-Tatari did not explain to 
Patient E the purpose of this part of the examination or the reason for his comment.  
 
On another occasion, Dr. El-Tatari also touched her face with his hand, and told her he does that 
to all his favourite patients. Dr. El-Tatari’s conduct made Patient E uncomfortable. 
 
Patient F  
 
Patient F was a patient of Dr. El-Tatari from 2012 to 2013. During his appointments with Patient 
F, Dr. El-Tatari regularly hugged Patient F, and told her she was his “favourite patient.” During 
one appointment in or about July 2013, Dr. El-Tatari kissed Patient F on the cheek and, while 
hugging her, asked Patient F what she would like him to do. Dr. El-Tatari’s conduct made 
Patient F uncomfortable.  Patient F stopped seeing Dr. El-Tatari after this appointment. 
 
Patient G  
 
Patient G was a patient of Dr. El-Tatari from 2011 to 2013. At the end of appointments with 
Patient G, Dr. El-Tatari regularly hugged Patient G. Patient G found the hugs “weird.” On one 
occasion, Dr. El-Tatari commented to Patient G’s boyfriend that he loved Patient G and that 
Patient G was “like a sister” to him. Patient G found the comment unprofessional. 
 
Patient H  
 
Patient H was a patient of Dr. El-Tatari in 2011 and 2012. On one occasion, during a clinically 
indicated pelvic examination, while checking her pelvic tone, Dr. El-Tatari commented on the 
 tightness of her pelvic tone. Dr. El-Tatari did not provide an adequate explanation to Patient H as 
 to the reasons for this comment. Patient H felt shocked and upset by the comment.  
  
 Dr. El-Tatari pleads no contest to the facts as set out above and does not contest that the conduct 
 described constitutes acts or omissions relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to 
 all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonorable or 
 unprofessional.  
  
 DISPOSITION 
  
 The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
 -  Dr. El-Tatari attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
  

 -  The Registrar suspend Dr. El-Tatari’s certificate of registration for a period of five (5) 
    months, commencing from May 1, 2019 at 12:01 a.m. 
 -  The Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. El-Tatari’s 
    certificate of registration: 
    (i)   Dr. El-Tatari shall comply with the College Policy #2-07 “Practice Management 
         Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of 
         Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation”, a copy of which is attached at 
         Schedule “A” to this Order; 
   (ii)  Dr. El-Tatari shall not engage in any professional encounters of any kind, in person or 
         otherwise, with patients, unless the patient encounter takes place in the presence of a 
         College-approved monitor; 
   (iii) Dr. El-Tatari shall post a sign in each of his examination and consultations rooms that 
         states: “Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari must not have professional 
         encounters, in person or otherwise, with patients, unless in the continuous presence of 
         and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor acceptable to the College 
         of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr. El-Tatari must not be alone with patients 
         in any examination or consulting room. Further information may be found on the 
         College website at www.cpso.on.ca;” and 
    (iv)  Dr. El-Tatari shall successfully complete the Understanding Boundaries and 
         Managing the Risks Inherent in Doctor-Patient Relationships course offered by the 
         University of Western Ontario at his own expense, with a report or reports to be 
         provided by the provider to the College regarding Dr. El-Tatari’s progress and 
         compliance. Dr. El-Tatari will complete this requirement within 6 months of the date 
         of this Order or, if it is not possible to do so within 6 months, at the first available 
         Boundaries course for which Dr. El-Tatari is eligible. 
-  Dr. El-Tatari pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date 
   of this Order. 
 
Dr. El-Tatari waived his right to an appeal under subsection 70(1) of the Code and the 
Committee administered the public reprimand.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 30 2019 1:00 p.m. start time

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. El-Tatari engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his urgent care practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. El-Tatari will engage in professional education in orthopedics for family physicians, the assessment of ankle injuries, and patient-centred communications.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Other
Active Date: November 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

(1) 2 counts of Sexual Assault contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: May 18, 2018
Place of charges: Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Police Service


Source: Other
Active Date: June 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[May 18, 2018]

1. Do not associate or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with the named person(s).

2. Do not be within 25 metres of any place where he knows the named person(s) to live, work, attend school.