skip to content

Bassal, Mylene

CPSO#: 85832

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mylene Bassal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bassal ( CPSO# 85832 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 1, 2023
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 10, 2023, the Children’s Hospital of Eastern Ontario notified the College, pursuant to Section 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and Section 85.5(2) of the  Health Professional Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act), that Dr. Bassal resigned from the hospital as of May 1, 2023 during the course of a hospital investigation regarding Dr. Bassal.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MYLENE BASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASSAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2006