skip to content

Base, Gerald Sidney

CPSO#: 13867

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 2-Jan-2003

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1952
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Nov 1994