skip to content

Basak, Sanjukta

CPSO#: 91033

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Galaxy 12 clinic
Department of Pediatrics
12th floor
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 6474617030
Fax: 416281-7313 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kindercare Pediatrics
Suite 301, 491 Eglinton Ave. West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Canada
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Fax: (416) 848-7664
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-7500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANJUKTA BASAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014