skip to content

Bartoszko, Justyna

CPSO#: 100813

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Anesthesia
12th Floor, 123 Edward Street
Toronto, Ontario, M5G 1E2
Toronto ON  M5G 3E2
Phone: (416) 946-0926 Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JUSTYNA BARTOSZKO shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BARTOSZKO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BARTOSZKO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BARTOSZKO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BARTOSZKO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BARTOSZKO is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BARTOSZKO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019