skip to content

Barton, Guy John

CPSO#: 21535

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sheffield University School of Medicine, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
Xray Department
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4300 Ext. 4937
Fax: (905) 721-3560 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: G.J. Barton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Barton ( CPSO# 21535 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4937

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 04 May 2021 Active
 As from April 22, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Guy John Barton in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Barton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. GUY JOHN BARTON
("Dr. Barton")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
				
A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

 "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Barton, certificate of registration number 21535, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that the College received information about my diagnostic radiology practice, specifically my reporting of breast imaging studies. 

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Barton, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately. 

(5)	Practice Restrictions

(a)	I, Dr. Barton, undertake that I will not engage in the interpretation or reporting of breast imaging studies. 

(6)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Barton, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Barton, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Barton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(7)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(8)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(9)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(10)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(11)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(12)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(13)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Barton, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College received information regarding Dr. Barton's diagnostic radiology practice, specifically his reporting of breast imaging studies. Dr. Barton had voluntarily agreed not to interpret or report breast imaging studies. In response to College inquiries, Dr. Barton has entered into an undertaking with the College to reflect this agreement. 

D.	CONSENT

(14)	I, Dr. Barton, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 22, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Guy John Barton to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 22, 2021:

The College received information regarding Dr. Barton’s diagnostic radiology practice, specifically his reporting of breast imaging studies. Dr. Barton had voluntarily agreed not to interpret or report breast imaging studies. In response to College inquiries, Dr. Barton has entered into an undertaking with the College to reflect this agreement.