skip to content

Bartlett, Robert Paul

CPSO#: 24770

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R. Paul Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: Tavistock Community Health Inc. 80 Maria Street Tavistock, ON N0B 2R0 519-655-2322
Date Received: 06 May 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2020