skip to content

Bartlett, John Malcolm

CPSO#: 27066

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 13 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Mar 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Bartlett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Corporation Name: W. Vornberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 481 London Rd Sarnia ON N7T 4X3
Date Received: 29 Mar 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Mar 2019