skip to content

Bartfeld, Naama

CPSO#: 86707

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C9-1410
Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4H6
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bartfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bartfeld ( CPSO# 86707 )

Business Address:
C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Maple ON  L6A 4H6
Phone Number: (905) 303-2700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAAMA BARTFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARTFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009