skip to content

Barsoum, Milad Kamal

CPSO#: 26259

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 22 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:05 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 18 Jun 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015