skip to content

Barron, Stanley Perry

CPSO#: 21317

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 19 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Apr 2019

Summary

Date of Death: 19-Apr-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1968
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 19 Apr 2019