skip to content

Barrett, Lisa

CPSO#: 92082

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014
EXPIRY DATE
14 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 09 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014