skip to content

Barrett, Keith Paul

CPSO#: 91216

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kitchener Urology Partners
Suite 202, 148 Manitou Dr
Kitchener ON  N2C 1L3
Phone: 519 954 2370
Fax: 519 954 8560 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barrett ( CPSO# 91216 )

Business Address:
Urology Associates
18-450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 0B5
Phone Number: (519) 578-1282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEITH PAUL BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014