skip to content

Barrett, Chantel Taryn

CPSO#: 96779

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
343 Booth Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030
Fax: (613) 233-1061 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-798-5555 Ext. 19164
Fax: 613-761-5360
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHANTEL TARYN BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2011 to 24 Oct 2011
EL - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 19 Sep 2012
EL - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2015