skip to content

Barr, Ronald Duncan

CPSO#: 42313

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Room 3N27B
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76465
Fax: (905) 521-1703 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ronald D. Barr, Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Barr ( CPSO# 42313 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Health Sciences Centre
Room 3N27B
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Records Location

Address: McMaster Children's Hospital 1200 Main St W Hamilton, ON L8N 3Z5
Date Received: 01 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019