skip to content

Barnett Tapia, Carolina

CPSO#: 94087

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2015
EXPIRY DATE
14 Sep 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Cat¢lica de Chile, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Neurology
200 Elizabeth Street. 5EC Room 334
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3957
Fax: (416) 340-4081 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Carolina Barnett Tapia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Barnett Tapia ( CPSO# 94087 )

Business Address:
UHN General Hospital
Division of Neurology
Eaton Building, 5th Floor, Room 334
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Chile

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:15 Sep 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 14 Sep 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2015 Active
             1.    Dr. Carolina Barnett Tapia may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Neurology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Barnett
                        Tapia holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Barnett Tapia  no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Barnett Tapia's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Barnett Tapia's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 15, 2015.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on September 14, 2022.