skip to content

Barnabe, Patrick

CPSO#: 25954

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Jul 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
381 Kent Street
Suite 4001
Ottawa ON  K2P 2A8
Phone: (613) 238-2698
Fax: (613) 238-7731 Electoral District: 07

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 12 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 12 Jul 2019 Active
             As from July 12, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Patrick Barnabe, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Barnabe to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                       DR. PATRICK BARNABE
                                          ("Dr. Barnabe")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public;
                  
                  "QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Barnabe, certificate of registration number 25954, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with
                  respect to my practice. I am aware of the College's concern about
                  protecting the public.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Resignation

                  (a)   I, Dr. Barnabe, hereby resign from the College, effective March 31,
                        2020 (the "Date of Resignation").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Barnabe, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for
                        registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any
                        other jurisdiction after the Date of Resignation.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge and provide consent that in the event
                        that the College should become aware that I am in breach of this
                        Undertaking including, but not limited to, becoming aware that I
                        have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply
                        for registration as a physician or for a certificate of
                        registration, or equivalent, to practise medicine in any
                        jurisdiction after the Date of Resignation, the College shall, in
                        its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary
                        proceeding on the basis of a breach of this Undertaking and shall
                        have the right to seek direction from the QAC with respect to any
                        further action that may be required in connection with my practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to the College to abide by the College's
                        Policy on Practice Management Considerations for Physicians Who
                        Cease to Practise, Take an Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their
                        Practice Due to Relocation, a copy of which is attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A". 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to the College that upon signing this
                        Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of
                        the OHIP that my billing number be deactivated for services
                        rendered after the Date of Resignation. I acknowledge that I have
                        executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "D" and
                        that the consent forms part of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or supervisors acceptable to the College (the
                        "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), until March 31,
                        2020 ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              as Appendix "C";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations;
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College once every three (3)
                              months or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                        (ix)  The Clinical Supervisor will keep a log of all patients and
                              patient charts reviewed along with patient identifiers.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "C" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the
                        assessor dated April 24, 2019, and concerns that may arise during
                        the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice described in section (6) of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "B" attached, and undertake to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor as set out in sections (6)(e) and (7)(f) above, I will
                        cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a
                        Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" of "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Barnabe, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

            (8)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
                  consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
                  action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Barnabe's
                              practice. As a result:
                  
                              *     Dr. Barnabe has agreed to resign from the College
                                    effective March 31, 2020 and has agreed never to apply
                                    or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario
                                    or any other jurisdiction.
                  
                              *     Dr. Barnabe will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until
                                    March 31, 2020. 
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Barnabe, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Barnabe, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (17)  I, Dr. Barnabe, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Barnabe, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Barnabe, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "B";
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and

                  (d)   which comes to their attention and which they reasonably believe
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patrick Barnabe to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 12, 2019:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Barnabe’s practice. As a result:

• Dr. Barnabe has agreed to resign from the College effective March 31, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

• Dr. Barnabe will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until March 31, 2020.