skip to content

Barisic, Dusan

CPSO#: 99576

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:Wayne State University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Metropolitan Campus
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 985-2606 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Dept. of Emergency Medicine
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Ouellette Campus
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (510) 254-5577 Ext. ext. 34401
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

194 Talbot West
Erie Shores HealthCare
Dept of Emergency Medicine
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 519-326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: D. Barisic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Barisic ( CPSO# 99576 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 May 2014 Active
             Dr.  Dusan  Barisic  may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine,
            only