skip to content

Baril-Guerard, Elyse Marie Christine

CPSO#: 89653

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Méde, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 28 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 29 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2010