skip to content

Baribeau, Jean-Guy Yves

CPSO#: 33702

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Feb 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Baribeau, Joseph Jean-Guy Yves (used until: 14 Sep 1982 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 04 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Feb 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: February 15, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Jean-Guy Yves Baribeau to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 15, 2019:

Dr. Baribeau was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of professional misconduct. After the allegations were referred to the Discipline Committee and prior to the hearing, Dr. Baribeau resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)