skip to content

Bariana, Sam Singh

CPSO#: 86010

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Mar 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5
860 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 4N5
Phone: (905) 463-2095
Fax: (905) 463-2096 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

15 Brenda Boulevard
Suite 12
Orangeville
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y5
Canada
Phone: (519) 307-2095
Fax: (905) 463-2096
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Bariana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bariana ( CPSO# 86010 )

Business Address:
12 - 15 Brenda Avenue
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y5
Phone Number: (519) 307-2095

Business Address:
5 - 860 North Park Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 4N5
Phone Number: (905) 463-2095


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAM SINGH BARIANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARIANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Mar 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2009