skip to content

Bardon, Alexander David

CPSO#: 96828

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
20 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Bardon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 31 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Apr 2021