skip to content

Barbour, Sean Jacob

CPSO#: 90432

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 26 Jun 2009
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2012