skip to content

Barbero, Joseph

CPSO#: 88770

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Marks Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone: (807) 597-2721 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joseph Barbero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Barbero ( CPSO# 88770 )

Business Address:
123 Marks Street
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 597-2721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BARBERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARBERO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010