skip to content

Barber, Neil Kevin

CPSO#: 27896

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 Oct 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen's Family Health Team, 220 Bagot Street, Kingston, ON K7L 5E9
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015


Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 Feb 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015