skip to content

Baranick, Peter Paul

CPSO#: 31037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Sep 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Clinic
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3
Phone: (613) 236-9473 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Baranick-Robertson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Robertson ( CPSO# 31308 )
Dr. P. Baranick ( CPSO# 31037 )

Business Address:
Apple Tree Medical Clinic
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K2H 7B3

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8309

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 05 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 12 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 12 Aug 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2019
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 28 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Jun 2017 Active
             As from 1:30 p.m., June 12, 2017, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Peter Paul Baranick:


            (b)   Dr. Baranick shall limit his practice to no more than six (6) patients
                  per hour;
                  Clinical Supervision
                  
            (j)   Dr. Baranick shall co-operate with unannounced inspections and shall
                  consent to the monitoring of his OHIP billings of his Practice by a
                  College representative(s), for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing
                  his compliance with the terms of this Order;

            (k)   Dr. Baranick shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practises or has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction within fifteen (15) days of
                  this Order, and shall inform the College of any and all new Practice
                  Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that
                  location; and

            As from September 23, 2015, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Paul Baranick in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Baranick has provided to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Baranick is prohibited from prescribing the following drugs, substances and
            preparations set out in the corresponding regulations, as amended from time to
            time, and summarized as follows:

                  (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  (iv)  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                        or
                  (v)   All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);        
            and as amended from time to time.

            Dr. Baranick shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his
            Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Baranick must not prescribe
            Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
            Other Targeted Substances, and/or all other Monitored Drugs. Further
            information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
            website at www.cpso.on.ca". The sign shall be translated into any language(s)
            in which Dr. Baranick provides services, posted in the waiting rooms of all his
            Practice Locations, in a clearly visible location. 

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 Jan 2019
Summary:

On January 30, 2019, on the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission, the 
Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baranick committed an act of professional misconduct, in 
that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADMISSION 
 
Dr. Peter Paul Baranick is a 73 year-old physician who received his certificate of registration 
authorizing independent practice on August 3, 1979. At the relevant time, Dr. Baranick practised 
in Ottawa, Ontario.  
 
In May 2015, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee considered a report of a 
Registrar’s Investigation into Dr. Baranick’s practice relating to his prescribing. In September 
2015, Dr. Baranick signed an undertaking stating, among other things, that he: 
 
   -  Will  not  issue  new  prescriptions  or  renew  existing  prescriptions  for  narcotic  drugs, 
      narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances, 
      and all other monitored drugs; and 
 
   -  Shall post a sign in  the waiting  rooms of all of his  practice locations advising of his 
      prescribing restriction. 

Dr.  Baranick practises at  various  locations  of  the  Appletree  Medical  Clinics  in  Ottawa. On 
October  2017,  College  staff  attended  Appletree  Clinic A and  noted  that  the  signs  were  not 
posted. Clinic staff advised that Dr. Baranick was not working there currently and that the sign 
was posted whenever Dr. Baranick was working there. College staff were advised that he was 
currently working at Appletree Clinic B. College staff then proceeded to Appletree Clinic B and 
noted that signs were posted. Dr. Baranick was working at this location and spoke with College 
staff. He advised that signs were posted when he came into the office to work.  

In  December 2017,  the  College  sent  a  letter  to  Dr.  Baranick’s  counsel  requesting  that  Dr. 
Baranick post his prescribing restriction signs in the waiting rooms of all practice locations. By 
letter dated December 2017, Dr. Baranick’s counsel indicated that having the signs posted when 
Dr.  Baranick  is  not  working  at  a  particular  location  “falls  outside  the  spirit  and  intent  of  his 
undertaking” and that there is no value in posting the signs if he is not present as it would cause 
confusion amongst patients.  

In December 2017, the College sent a letter to Dr. Baranick’s counsel requesting that he comply 
with his undertaking and post the required signage at all locations regardless of whether he is 
working there that day or not.  

In January 2018, Dr. Baranick’s counsel advised that Dr. Baranick had posted his prescribing 
restrictions signs at all practice locations. In January 2018, Dr. Baranick’s counsel was advised 
that no further action would be taken as the College was advised that the signs were posted at all 
locations.  
 

In February  2018,  College  staff  attended Appletree  Clinic  C.  Clinic  staff  advised  that  Dr. 
Baranick did not work there and therefore the sign was not posted. College staff was told that Dr. 
Baranick was working at Appletree Clinic A. College staff attended Appletree Clinic A  and did 
not see the required sign posted. Appletree Clinic A staff advised that Dr. Baranick would be 
working later that day and that the sign would be posted when he starts to work. College staff 
advised the clinic staff that the sign is required to be posted at all times and the clinic staff person 
said she would post the sign.  

In February  2018,  College  staff  attended Appletree  Clinic A and Appletree  Clinic D.  The 
required signs were posted at both these locations. College staff also attended Appletree Clinic 
B, where signs were not posted.  

By letter dated March 2018, Dr. Baranick’s counsel requested a variance of section 5(a) of his 
undertaking,  stating  that  Dr.  Baranick  should  only  be  required  to  post  his  sign  where  he  is 
physically present on any given day.  

In April 2018, the College sent a letter to Dr. Baranick’s counsel advising that despite previous 
reassurances, recent compliance visits in February showed inconsistent practices at the various 
Appletree  Clinics  where  the  required  signage  was  not  posted.  The  College  reiterated  that  the 
signs are expected to be up at all of Dr. Baranick’s practice locations at all times. The College 
also advised that if the ICRC accepted the proposed wording, an amended undertaking would be 
provided for signature.  

The variance to the undertaking requested by Dr. Baranick was not granted by the College. 

In January 2018, the College received data from the Narcotics Monitoring System for the period 
of June 2016 to December 2017 related to Dr. Baranick’s prescribing.  

In January 2018, the College  contacted the pharmacies identified in  Dr. Baranick’s Narcotics 
Monitoring System data. The College requested copies of four prescriptions from the pharmacies 
where the pharmacist advised that Dr. Baranick wrote the prescription after he had signed his 
undertaking.  

The  College  received  three  prescriptions  signed  by  Dr.  Baranick  and  dated  November 2015, 
January 2017, and December 2017. Each of the prescriptions was for a testosterone medication 
that Dr. Baranick was prohibited from prescribing pursuant to the September 2015 Undertaking.  

In February 2018,  Dr.  Baranick’s  counsel  advised  that  Dr.  Baranick  did  not  initiate  the 
prescriptions,  but  did  refill  them.  He  wanted  to  reassure  the  College  that  this  was  an  honest 
mistake and that he never intended to breach his undertaking. To prevent this from occurring 
again, he had reviewed his undertaking and the lists of drugs and substances he is restricted from 
prescribing.  

Dr.  Baranick  admits  the  facts  specified  above  and  admits  that,  based  on  these  facts,  he  has 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to  all  the  circumstances,  would  reasonably  be  regarded  by  members  as  disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to paragraph 1(1)33 of O. Reg. 856/93. 

AGREED STATEMENT OF FACTS RELEVANT TO PENALTY 
 
Dr. Baranick entered into the September 2015 Undertaking as a result of a College investigation 
into his prescribing practices.  
 
As a result of the investigation, the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College 
(“the  ICRC”)  accepted  Dr.  Baranick’s  September  2015  Undertaking  to  give  up  his  narcotics 
prescribing  privileges  and  required  Dr.  Baranick  to  attend  at  the  College  to  be  cautioned  in 
person.  
 
Dr. Baranick’s Discipline History 
On June 12, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baranick had failed to meet the 
standard of practice of the profession. The discipline hearing arose out of a reassessment of Dr. 
Baranick’s practice pursuant to an Undertaking with the College that Dr. Baranick signed on July 
10, 2013 (the “July 2013 Undertaking”). The College’s assessor opined that Dr. Baranick failed 
to meet the standard of practice of the profession with respect to his record-keeping, assessment 
and management of community acquired infections, infant care, and chronic illness such as 
arthritis, diabetes and hypercholesterolemia. Dr. Baranick admitted the allegations. 
 
The Discipline Committee accepted a joint submission on penalty and ordered a reprimand, a 2-
month suspension of Dr. Baranick’s certificate of registration, and terms, conditions and 
limitations on Dr. Baranick’s certificate of registration, including that he complete a 
comprehensive Continuing Medical Education program focusing on the areas of concern raised 
by the assessor, that he continue to limit his practice to no more than six patients per hour, and 
that he undergo a six-month period of clinical supervision followed by a re-assessment of his 
practice. The Discipline Committee also ordered that Dr. Baranick pay costs to the College at the 
tariff rate.  
 
The reassessment of Dr. Baranick’s practice took place in November and December 2018. The 
College's assessor reviewed twenty patient charts and conducted a telephone interview with Dr. 
Baranick. The College's assessor concluded that for all twenty patient charts reviewed, Dr. 
Baranick had met the standard of care of the profession and had displayed appropriate 
knowledge, skills and judgment.  
 
DISPOSITION 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that: 
   -  The Registrar suspend Dr. Baranick’s certificate of registration for a period of 1 month, 
      commencing immediately.  
   -  Dr. Baranick appear before the panel to be reprimanded.  
   -  Dr. Baranick to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the 
      date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 30, 2019 1:00 p.m . start


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Jun 2017
Summary:

On June 12, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Baranick committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. 
  
Dr. Baranick is a family physician practising at Appletree Medical walk-in Clinics in Ottawa. He 
obtained his medical degree from the University of Ottawa in 1973 and has held an independent 
practice certificate with this College from 1979 to 1982 and from 1989 to present. 
 
2012 Practice Re-Assessment  
 
On February 15, 2010, Dr. Baranick signed an Undertaking with the College to practice under 
Clinical Supervision, to successfully complete Medical Record-Keeping and Ethics courses, and 
to undergo a re-inspection of his practice.  
 
The College retained an independent medical expert to conduct the re-assessment of Dr. 
Baranick’s practice pursuant to the 2010 Undertaking. The medical expert indicated that 
although Dr. Baranick is an experienced clinician who has worked in primary patient care for 
most of his career, he has recently made the transition from working in the Emergency 
Department of a hospital to seeing unscheduled patients in a number of ambulatory clinics.  
 
The medical expert reported that Dr. Baranick admitted that he sees too many patients during his 
shifts, and this may be one factor that has resulted in poor notations on the charts of his patients. 
The medical expert noted that Dr. Baranick recently took one of the College’s courses on record-
keeping and should be familiar with the College’s guidelines. In addition, the medical expert was 
surprised that Dr. Baranick did not seem familiar with “SOAP” format advocated by the College, 
and that he rarely uses that format to help him structure his patient assessments.   
 
The medical expert concluded that Dr. Baranick fails to meet the standard of practice of a 
competent practitioner in his care of patients. Specifically, he found that beyond charting issues: 
 
-  Dr. Baranick's care displays a lack of medical knowledge of clinical conditions commonly 
   seen in the walk-in setting, including upper respiratory tract infections, eye and ear problems, 
   genito-urinary conditions and asthma. This hampers Dr. Baranick’s abilities to appropriately 
   assess patients and to effectively manage their problems.  
-  Dr.Baranick’s assessment of ocular problems exemplifies that in some instances Dr. 
   Baranick’s care displays a lack of skill.  
-  Dr. Baranick’s care displays a lack of judgment in management of patients requesting repeats 
   of prescription drugs, with the potential to expose such patients to harm. 
 
The medical expert recommended that: 
 
-  Dr. Baranick make efforts to limit the number of patients seen during his shifts, that he make 
   efforts to identify areas of clinical weakness in addition to those identified during the medical 
   expert’s reassessment process, and that he take steps to increase his medical knowledge. 
-  Dr. Baranick’s practice be supervised by a clinician whose practice is more closely aligned 
   with that of Dr. Baranick and that his practice be subsequently reassessed. 
       
2013 Practice Assessment  
 
On April 17, 2013 the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee considered the expert’s 
report and directed another Undertaking for Dr. Baranick to restrict his practice to no more than 
6 patients per hour, to complete the Comprehensive Family Practice Review (CFPR) course, to 
practice under supervision of a Clinical Supervisor, and to undergo a comprehensive practice 
reassessment.   
       
An independent medical expert who conducted the comprehensive practice assessment opined 
that although Dr. Baranick is an experienced physician who has undergone reassessment and 
remediation of his practice in previous years, he still fails to meet the standard of practice of the 
profession in his record keeping due to legibility concerns and in not providing enough detail 
about some presenting complaints. Also, Dr. Baranick does not meet the standard of practice of 
the profession in assessing and managing community acquired infections, infant care, and 
chronic illness, such as arthritis, diabetes, and hypercholesterolemia. The medical expert 
concluded that Dr. Baranick demonstrates a lack of knowledge, skill, and judgment in these areas 
which have a potential to cause harm. 
 
On June 12, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  The Registrar suspend Dr. Baranick’s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months 
   effective immediately. 
-  The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Baranick’s 
   certificate of registration: 
   (a)   Dr. Baranick shall, within six (6) months of the end of the period of the suspension, 
         complete a comprehensive Continuing Medical Education (CME) program acceptable 
         to the College focusing on the areas of concern raised in the report of the College 
         assessor dated March 30, 2016; 
   (b)   Dr. Baranick shall limit his practice to no more than six (6) patients per hour; 
   Clinical Supervision 
   (c)   Within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, Dr. Baranick shall obtain a clinical 
         supervisor acceptable to the College, who will supervise Dr. Baranick for a period of 
         six (6) months, and who will sign an undertaking in the form attached to this Order as 
         Appendix A (“Clinical Supervisor”); 
   (d)   The Clinical Supervision shall be at a moderate level for six (6) months, commencing 
         on the date following the expiry of the suspension of Dr. Baranick’s certificate of 
         registration.  The Clinical Supervisor will meet with Dr. Baranick bi-weekly and 
         review a minimum of ten (10) of Dr. Baranick’s patient charts, discuss  Dr. 
         Baranick’s patient care, treatment plan and follow-up, identify any concerns 
         regarding the care, treatment plan and follow-up and make recommendations for 
         improvement;  
   (e)   Within three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision, Dr. 
         Baranick will submit to a reassessment of his practice (the “Reassessment”) by an 
         assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor(s)”).  The Reassessment 
         may include a chart review, direct observation of Dr. Baranick’s care, interviews with 
         colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed 
         necessary by the College.  Dr. Baranick shall abide by all recommendations made by 
            the Assessor(s), and the results of the Reassessment will be reported to the College 
            and may form the basis of further action by the College; 
      (f)   Dr. Baranick shall cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision and abide by all 
            recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor(s) with respect to practice improvements 
            and education; 
      (g)   Dr. Baranick shall consent to the disclosure by the Clinical Supervisor to the College, 
            and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information the Clinical 
            Supervisor or the College deems necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical 
            Supervisor’s undertaking and to monitor Dr. Baranick’s compliance with this Order.  
            This shall include, without limitation, providing the Clinical Supervisor with any 
            reports of any assessments of Dr. Baranick’s practice in the College’s possession;  
      (h)   If a Clinical Supervisor who has given an undertaking in Schedule “A” to this Order 
            is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, Dr. Baranick shall, within 
            twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the 
            same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and 
            ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time; 
      (i)   If Dr. Baranick is unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor in accordance with 
            paragraphs 4(b) or 4(g) of this Order, he shall cease practising medicine until such 
            time as he has done so, and the fact that he has will constitute a term, condition or 
            limitation on his certificate of registration until that time;  
      (j)   Dr. Baranick shall co-operate with unannounced inspections and shall consent to the 
            monitoring of his OHIP billings of his Practice by a College representative(s), for the 
            purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order; 
      (k)   Dr. Baranick shall inform the College of each and every location that he practises or 
            has privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any 
            jurisdiction within fifteen (15) days of this Order, and shall inform the College of any 
            and all new Practice Locations within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at 
            that location; and 
      (l)   Dr. Baranick shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing 
            the terms of this Order. 
-  Dr. Baranick attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Baranick pay to the College costs in the amount of $5,500.00, within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): June 12, 2017

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)