skip to content

Baran, Iwona

CPSO#: 90544

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-8950 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IWONA BARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2014