skip to content

Bar, Jair

CPSO#: 89728

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Bar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - R - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2008 to 04 Feb 2009
EL - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 08 Jul 2009 to 04 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2012