skip to content

Bansal, Rahul Kumar

CPSO#: 96660

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Dayanand Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-400 Taché Ave
Winnipeg MB  R2H 3C3

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAHUL KUMAR BANSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANSAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 19 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Urology

McMaster University, 20 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2022