skip to content

Banks, Brie Ann

CPSO#: 99188

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Brie Banks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )

Business Address:
Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 541-2239

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIE ANN BANKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANKS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 07 Aug 2012 to 26 Aug 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Oct 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Jan 2013 to 15 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2014