skip to content

Banerjee, Diponkar

CPSO#: 31020

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Sep 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Diponkar Banerjee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 5960 Eagleridge Dr West Vancouver BC V7W 3A9
Date Received: 10 Sep 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 2018