skip to content

Bandukwala, Taha Shabbir

CPSO#: 95124

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 905-494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: T.S. Bandukwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 22 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAHA SHABBIR BANDUKWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BANDUKWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016